Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0069 / CH0174Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and PenaltiesChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 174Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0722Estate Taxes - Qualified Family-Owned Business Property - ExclusionDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0090 / CH0180
    (HB0548)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement FundSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0451
    (HB0412)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0962Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure RequirementsDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0252Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0773Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - TaxDelegate BurnsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0205
    (SB0100)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0208
    (SB0120)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1374Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Gross Receipts - DefinitionDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1036Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on NonresidentsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1302Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0879Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0170
    (HB0858 / CH0645)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0412
    (SB0451)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0548
    (SB0090 / CH0180)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1031 / CH0518
    (SB0658 / CH0517)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0700
    (HB0683)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
SB0100
    (HB0205)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0120
    (HB0208)
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and RefundsSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0658 / CH0517
    (HB1031 / CH0518)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0994Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
HB0280Maryland Death Taxes - Family Property Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0683
    (SB0700)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
HB0967Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of LimitationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0011Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - RepealDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0384Admissions and Amusement Tax - Returns and PenaltiesDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0920Tax Liens - EnforceabilityDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0858 / CH0645
    (SB0170)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.