Transportation - Generally (R2)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1013Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit FinancingSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0906Transportation - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
SB0653Sales and Use Tax - Mass TransitSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0652Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit FundingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0486 / CH0483
    (HB0523 / CH0484)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0362Sales and Use Tax - Motor Fuel - Local Transportation TaxSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0182Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - ProhibitionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0030
    (HB0528)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1510Montgomery County - Transportation - Block GrantMontgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1325Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost AnalysisDelegate WoodIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1142Mass Transit - Failure to Vacate Seat Designated for Elderly or Handicapped - PenaltyDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1093Transit Vehicles - Prohibited Acts - Use of Obscene LanguageDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1000Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0938Transit Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0797 / CH0140Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water AccessDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0784Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate IncreaseDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0771Mass Transit Trust FundDelegate BatesIn the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and AppropriationsWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB0755Transportation - Transit Vehicle Operators - Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication DevicesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0528
    (SB0030)
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildDelegate BarnesIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Rules
HB0523 / CH0484
    (SB0486 / CH0483)
Short-Term Rental of Motorcycles - Sales and Use Tax and Motor Vehicle LawDelegate MyersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0234 / CH0360Transportation - Baltimore Corridor Red Line Transit StudyDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0198Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Violations - ReportingDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.