Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0716
    (HB0917 / CH0287)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0664
    (HB0454)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0410 / CH0168
    (HB0506)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetySenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0125
    (HB0097)
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's FamilySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
HB0917 / CH0287
    (SB0716)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0506
    (SB0410 / CH0168)
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic SafetyDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0454
    (SB0664)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0233 / CH0080Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading DevicesDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0097
    (SB0125)
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's FamilyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.