Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
SB0072 / CH0176Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and PenaltiesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0073 / CH0018Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening StandardsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0693Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate ConwayIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0886Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning DevicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0873
    (HB0444)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and InspectionsSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
HB0444
    (SB0873)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and InspectionsDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
HB1235Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted WindowsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0885Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard AirbagsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1415Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and EquipmentDelegate MyersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1392
    (SB0943)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudyDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1006Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited ActsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0682Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionDelegate ReadyIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0943
    (HB1392)
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - StudySenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0036Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.