SB0101 (CH0143)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment

Sponsored by:

Senator Norman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143


Synopsis:Providing that the use of a firearm in the commission of a certain felony or other crime of violence constitutes a crime of violence; altering the circumstances under which sexual abuse of a minor is a crime of violence; eliminating parole eligibility for certain violent offenders; adding to a list of convictions that may be expunged under certain circumstances; providing that a petition for expungement may not be filed earlier than 15 years after the person satisfies the sentences for all convictions for which expungement is requested; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Norman
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0510 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Narrow Subject(s):Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Expungement
Guns
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Sexual Offenses
Violence -see also- Domestic Violence; Harassment; Threats
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(14-101)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(10-110)
Article - Health - General
(8-505, 8-506, 8-507)
Article - Public Safety
(5-133)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 2:24 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate11/15/201711/15/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/4/20181/4/2018Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {338771/1 Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed with Amendments20
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary23
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20184/7/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/7/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments {492812/1 Report Adopted64
Floor Committee Amendment {752117/1 Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20183/31/2018Floor Amendment {743924/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected65
Special Order until later this session (Delegate Angel) Adopted 65
Floor Amendment {253720/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected65
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (107-31)65
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (38-7)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:55 P.M.