SB0160 (CH0517)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Cassilly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517


Synopsis:Establishing specified subsequent offender penalties for specified offenses that result in the death or life-threatening injury to another as the result of a specified person driving, operating, or controlling a vehicle or vessel; and providing that specified offenses committed in another state or federal jurisdiction are to be considered for the application of specified subsequent offender penalties.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Cassilly, Brochin, Hough, Lee, Muse, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, Ready, and Zirkin
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0232 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Narrow Subject(s):Accidents
Boats and Ships
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder
Manslaughter
Motor Vehicle Operation
Negligence -see also- Medical Malpractice
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(2-209, 2-210, 2-503 through 2-506, 3-211)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20161/15/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/20/20161/20/2016Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {848778/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/21/20163/19/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)48
House3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Judiciary51
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (141-0)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.