SB0160 (CH0707)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Juvenile Law – Truancy

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707


Synopsis:Altering, to under 16 years of age rather than 18 years, the age range for which a certain charge relating to truancy is applicable; reducing the maximum terms of imprisonment from 10 to 3 days for a first conviction and 30 to 5 days for subsequent convictions under the Act; authorizing the imposition of community service on conviction of certain charges related to truancy; and altering the application of a certain affirmative defense relating to a certain truancy charge.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Guzzone, Madaleno, McFadden, Robinson, Rosapepe, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Juvenile Law
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Truancy
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-301)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:32 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20182/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/14/20182/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {508474/1 Report Adopted26
Second Reading Passed with Amendments26
2/19/20182/19/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)29
House2/20/20182/20/2018First Reading Judiciary30
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20184/3/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable with Amendments {442813/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (46-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 707

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.