SB0190 (CH0143)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 143


Synopsis:Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0150
Bill File Type: Regular
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and TaxationAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments43
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted43
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments44
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 44
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments45
Committee Amendment (#1-10) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#11-24) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#25-30) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#31-43) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#44-53) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#54-62) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#63-75) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#76-85) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#86-115) Adopted45
Committee Amendment (#116-124) Adopted45
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {853221/1 Rejected (16-29)45
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {373423/1 Rejected (16-27)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
House3/17/20163/14/2016First Reading Appropriations46
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/21/20163/19/2016Favorable with Amendments51
Special Order until 03/22 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 51
3/22/20163/20/2016Favorable with Amendments52
Committee Amendment (#1-6) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#7-18) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#19-25) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#26-35) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#36-41)52
Committee Amendment (#36-40) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#41) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#42-49) Adopted52
Committee Amendment (#50-56) Adopted52
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment (Delegate Reilly) {623224/1 Rejected (55-81)52
Floor Amendment (Delegate Turner) {903222/1 Adopted52
Floor Amendment (Delegate Turner) {443123/1 Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20163/21/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-5)53
Senate3/24/20163/22/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments51
Senate Requests House Recede51
Conference Committee Appointed51
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards51
Senate advisors:51
(Senators Currie, Serafini and Ferguson)51
House3/24/20163/22/2016House Refuses to Recede54
Conference Committee Appointed54
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel54
House advisors:54
(Delegates Haynes and Kaiser)54
Senate3/29/20163/25/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted (44-0)54
Third Reading Passed (45-0)54
House3/29/20163/24/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted56
Third Reading Passed (130-7)56
Senate3/29/20163/25/2016Passed Enrolled56
Post Passage4/12/20163/29/2016Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution
4/12/20164/12/2016Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 143

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.