SB0191 (CH0027)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,005,072,199 the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0151
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016, June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and TaxationAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/21/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/21/20163/18/2016Favorable with Amendments47A
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Peters) Adopted 47A
3/22/20163/20/2016Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-12) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#13-19) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#20-30) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#31-49) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#50-113) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20163/21/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)50
House3/23/20163/21/2016First Reading Appropriations53
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/28/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments55A
Special Order until 3/29 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 55A
3/29/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments56
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#2-7) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#8-24) Adopted56
Committee Amendment (#25-31) Adopted56
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/30/20163/25/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {813125/1 Rejected (55-77)57
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7)57
Senate3/30/20163/26/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments55
Senate Requests House Recede55
Conference Committee Appointed55
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards55
Senate advisors:55
(Senators Madaleno and Ferguson)55
House3/30/20163/25/2016House Refuses to Recede57
Conference Committee Appointed57
Delegates Jones, Ghrist, Haynes, McIntosh, and A. Miller57
House advisors:57
(Delegates Gaines and Reznik)57
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted (35-11)56
Third Reading Passed (44-2)56
House3/31/20163/26/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted58
Third Reading Passed (121-15)58
Senate3/31/20163/27/2016Passed Enrolled58
Post Passage4/8/20164/8/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.