SB0228 (CH0452)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings

Sponsored by:

Senator Salling

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452


Synopsis:Specifying that a jackpot won at a video lottery terminal that is not claimed by the winner within 182 days after the jackpot is won shall become the property of the State and be distributed in a specified manner.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Conway, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Young, Zucker, Smith, and McFadden
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB1108 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Gaming
Narrow Subject(s):Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Grants
Lottery
Minorities -see also- Women
Racing
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Small Business
Time
Video
Women -see also- Gender
Statutes:Article - State Government
(9-1A-26)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2/21/20172/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {609834/1 Report Adopted28
Second Reading Passed with Amendments28
2/23/20172/23/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)30
House2/24/20172/24/2017First Reading Ways and Means33
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (133-4)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.