SB0230

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

In the House - First Reading Economic Matters


Synopsis:Requiring employers that employ 15 or more employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same wage rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with 14 or fewer employees to provide unpaid earned sick and safe leave; prohibiting an employer from being required to pay a tipped employee more than a specified wage for earned sick and safe leave; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to develop a specified model paid sick and safe leave policy for use by specified employers; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0001
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0472 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Hearings
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Leave
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Finance
1/24/20171/24/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {717870/139
Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 39
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments {717870/140
Committee Amendment Adopted40
3/10/20173/9/2017Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Middleton) Adopted40
3/9/20173/9/2017Committee Amendment Withdrawn40
Substitute Committee Amendment {717870/2 Adopted40
Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 40
3/10/20173/10/2017Floor Amendment {943122/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted41
Floor Amendment {103428/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted41
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-19)41
Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-27)41
Floor Amendment {223624/1 (Senator Norman) Rejected (17-28)41
Floor Amendment {743823/3 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (18-27)41
Floor Amendment {923327/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (18-25)41
Floor Amendment {323223/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-27)41
Floor Amendment {283323/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (18-27)41
Floor Amendment {463028/1 (Senator Brochin) Withdrawn41
Floor Amendment {803122/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (16-26)41
Floor Amendment {923529/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (27-19)41
Floor Amendment {963329/1 (Senator Edwards) Rejected (18-26)41
Floor Amendment {993727/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (18-26)41
Floor Amendment {783929/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (16-27)41
Floor Amendment {753120/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (16-28)41
Floor Amendment {903527/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25)41
Floor Amendment {523227/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (16-28)41
Floor Amendment {523229/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (19-26)41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/14/20173/14/2017Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Middleton) Adopted43
Floor Amendment {973625/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted43
Floor Amendment {403522/2 (Senator Zirkin)43
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted43
3/15/20173/15/2017Floor Amendment {403522/2 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (20-26)44
Floor Amendment {823521/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-27)44
Floor Amendment {863423/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (17-28)44
Floor Amendment {973528/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (15-32)44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (29-18)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Economic Matters47

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.