SB0289 (CH0272)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - Governing Body, County Board and Commission Members, and Board of License Commissioners

Sponsored by:

Senator Hough

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272


Synopsis:Prohibiting an agent of a certain applicant from making a contribution to a member of the governing body of Frederick County during the pendency of a certain application; requiring certain members of the Frederick County Board of Zoning Appeals, Ethics Commission, or Planning Commission or the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County who establish an authorized candidate campaign committee to vacate office no more than 48 hours after opening a campaign account through a campaign finance entity; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Hough and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0630
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Counties - Local Laws
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Frederick County
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Candidates
Political Committees
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Zoning and Planning
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(20-201, 20-202)
Article - General Provisions
(5-857, 5-858, 5-860, 5-862, 5-865, 5-866)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2/12/20182/12/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20182/13/2018Favorable Report Adopted25
Second Reading Passed25
2/15/20182/15/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)27
House2/16/20182/16/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation28
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/9/20184/1/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed (139-0)67
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Returned Passed66
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.