SB0301

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment

Sponsored by:

Senator Feldman

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Providing that specified provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable; establishing specified requirements and procedures relating to an application to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to install or use electric vehicle recharging equipment; requiring specified owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for specified costs and disclosures; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Middleton, Rosapepe, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0699
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0168 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Alternative Energy Sources
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Condominiums
Damages
Disclosure
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Homeowners Associations
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Landlord and Tenant -see also- Eviction; Leases & Rent; etc.
Leases and Rent
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Parking
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Real Property
Statutes:Article - Real Property
(11-111.4, 11B-111.7)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 8, 2017 11:08 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20172/20/2017Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.