SB0363 (CH0821)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821


Synopsis:Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of State Board of Pharmacy regulations to prescribe and dispense specified contraceptives; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2018, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians, the State Board of Nursing, and specified stakeholders to adopt regulations establishing the conditions under which pharmacists may prescribe and dispense contraceptives; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Conway
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Public Health
Insurance - Health
Narrow Subject(s):Birth Control -see also- Reproductive Matters
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(15-101, 15-148)
Article - Health Occupations
(12-101, 12-511)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:16 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {464531/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (31-15)51
House3/24/20173/21/2017First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations55
4/4/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (115-22)66
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:16 A.M.