SB0452 (CH0731)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Accountability Program - Assessments (More Learning, Less Testing Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, a specified middle school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Board, in collaboration with specified entities and individuals, to redesign the high school level social studies assessment for implementation in the 2018-2019 school year; requiring specified county boards to establish on or before specified dates a District Committee on Assessments; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Manno, Benson, Brochin, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Smith, Young, Zirkin, Zucker, and Pinsky
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {824533/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Ways and Means47
3/17/20173/17/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {605167/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/6/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)64
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (47-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:11 P.M.