SB0591 (CH0565)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565


Synopsis:Requiring a specified notice of an action to foreclose the right of redemption to be sent to a homeowners association or a condominium association; requiring a plaintiff in an action to foreclose the right of redemption on property to be liable for the payment of specified assessments or fees incurred after the date of judgment foreclosing the right of redemption; authorizing a specified action to be filed to collect specified assessments or fees; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator King
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0970
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property
Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Condominiums
Deeds
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Foreclosure
Homeowners Associations
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Notices
Recordation
Tax Sales
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(14-836, 14-844)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
3/7/20163/7/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report Adopted39
Second Reading Passed39
3/10/20163/10/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)41
House3/11/20163/11/2016First Reading Environment and Transportation43
3/21/20163/21/2016Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20163/21/2016Hearing cancelled
3/21/20163/21/2016Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (137-0)64
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:09 P.M.