SB0678

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices

Sponsored by:

Senator Benson

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


Synopsis:Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications would be described as being in the skilled service or the professional service; providing certain requirements for employees hired beginning on July 1, 2018; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Oaks, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0627 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Education, State Department of
School Administration
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(2-104, 2-105)
Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(6-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Finance
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {877776/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (31-13)63
House4/6/20183/28/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m.
Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/3/2018Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (90-49)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.