SB0706

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Education Credit

Sponsored by:

Senator DeGrange

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Providing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the tax credit; requiring specified entities to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before December 1 each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators DeGrange, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Jennings, Klausmeier, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Peters, Reilly, and Serafini
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1343
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Discrimination
Examinations
Gifts
Grants
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(2.5-109)
Article - Tax - General
(10-205, 10-306, 10-737)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 31, 2016 2:36 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable43
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 43
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29)44
Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Adopted 44
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31)44
Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30)44
Second Reading Passed44
3/16/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (25-19)45
House3/17/20163/14/2016First Reading Ways and Means46
3/22/20163/22/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 24, 2016 11:36 A.M.