SB0747

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Wildlife Management - Shooting at Nighttime

Sponsored by:

Senator Astle

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (14-33)


Synopsis:Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from authorizing a holder or an agent of a holder of a Deer Management Permit to shoot or discharge a firearm at nighttime.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Astle
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Hunting and Fishing
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Guns
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Time
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(10-101, 10-415)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 17, 2018 12:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {504234/140
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted40
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {504234/141
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 41
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments42
Committee Amendment {504234/142
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted 42
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {504234/145
Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Conway) Adopted 45
3/14/20183/14/2018Committee Amendment Withdrawn46
Favorable Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway)46
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Miller) Adopted 46
3/16/20183/16/2018Floor Amendment {793829/2 (Senator Conway) Rejected (13-32)48A
Second Reading Passed48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Failed (14-33)48C

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 9:32 P.M.