SB0936 (CH0594)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act of 2016

Sponsored by:

Senator Manno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594


Synopsis:Extending a specified credit against the State income tax for electricity-producing facilities using specified qualified energy resources and placed in service on or after January 1, 2006, but before January 1, 2019; extending the period in which the Maryland Energy Administration may issue specified qualifying certifications to December 31, 2018; establishing the Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Tax Credit Reserve Fund; authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation to the Reserve Fund for fiscal years 2018-2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Manno
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Environment
Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Energy Sources
Appropriations
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Income Tax
Notices
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-720)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.