SB0945 (CH0512)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Raskin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512


Synopsis:Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require a person who is convicted of specified offenses relating to driving under the influence of alcohol to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for specified periods of time; increasing the suspension periods for the driver's license of a person who has refused or has specified results after a test for breath alcohol concentration; requiring a person whose license is suspended after specified results from a specified test to participate in the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Raskin, Brochin, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Ramirez, Ready, Rosapepe, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Narrow Subject(s):Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Forms
Hearings
Homicide -see also- Manslaughter; Murder
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Public Information
Signatures
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(16-205, 16-205.1, 16-404.1, 27-107.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20162/5/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/25/20163/23/2016Favorable with Amendments {468078/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20163/24/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)53
House3/29/20163/24/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations56
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/6/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {952311/2 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (134-2)62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/8/20164/2/2016Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments62
Senate Requests House Recede62
Conference Committee Appointed62
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman62
House4/8/20164/2/2016House Refuses to Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, and Proctor65
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted72
Third Reading Passed (141-0)72
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Passed Enrolled72
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.