SB1001

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)


Synopsis:Providing that, for fiscal year 2017, county boards of education shall be relieved of a specified portion of a contribution for specified local employees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; providing for a specified allocation of payment relief; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in either fiscal year 2018 or 2019 to be paid into specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System if a specified condition is not met; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Guzzone, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, King, Madaleno, McFadden, Miller, and Peters
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1109
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Governor
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Teachers
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {499337/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/16/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (32-14)45
House3/16/20173/13/2017First Reading Appropriations47
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20173/23/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/24 at 10:00 a.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/24/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14)55
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)55

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:13 P.M.