SB1073

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing that certain authority of railroad companies to acquire property by condemnation does not apply to an entity that owns or operates a railroad powered by a magnetic levitation propulsion system, or passenger or freight transportation for which pressurized capsules or pods travel at high speed in reduced-pressure tubes.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Pinsky
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Condemnation
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Railroads
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Weights and Measures
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(5-405 through 5-408, 5-409)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 4:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/23/20182/23/2018Rereferred to Finance
2/28/20182/28/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 2:44 P.M.