SB1103

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2019, for administration of a voluntary certificate program for ethical special education advocates; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to a certain applicant; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0966
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Age of Majority -see also- Minors
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Education, State Department of
Ethics
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Identification
Judicial Review -see also- Appeals
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Statutes:Article - Education
(8-420)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 9:02 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/14/20182/14/2018First Reading Senate Rules
2/23/20182/23/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/20182/26/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 5:29 P.M.