SB1227

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Education Aid - Mandated Educational Requirements - County Board Opt-Out

Sponsored by:

Senator Ready

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Providing that if less than 45% of a county board's 3-year moving average annual budget is funded by the State, the county board may, in the following school year, opt out of certain mandated educational requirements; requiring certain county boards to follow federally mandated education requirements; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Ready
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Federal Government
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2018 2:31 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules
3/16/20183/16/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 12:40 P.M.