SB1243

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

21st Century School Facilities Act

Sponsored by:

Senator DeGrange

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.


Synopsis:Altering the requirements for awarding contracts to bidders for school buildings; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to conduct a certain facility assessment; specifying the process for the review and approval of public school construction projects; establishing the Local Share of School Construction Costs Revolving Loan Fund; declaring the intent of the General Assembly regarding funding for public school construction; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators DeGrange, King, and Serafini
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1783
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Capital Budget
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Assessments
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
General Services, Department of
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Interest
Investments -see also- Securities
Leases and Rent
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Partnerships
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities -see also- Stadiums; St Hse
Public Schools
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Solicitation
Stadium Authority
Time
Treasurers
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(10-610.1)
Article - Education
(2-303, 4-114, 4-126, 5-112, 5-301, 5-302, 5-309, 5-310, 4-134, 5-301.3, 5-314, 5-315)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(4-809, 6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate3/5/20183/5/2018First Reading Senate Rules
3/8/20183/9/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/9/20183/9/2018Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 14, 2018 1:57 P.M.