HB1215 (CH0408)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - Study

Sponsored by:

Delegate Walker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408


Synopsis:Requiring the Consumer Protection Division of the Office of the Attorney General to conduct a study of the consumer protections available to purchasers of home appliances who seek enforcement of specified warranties; requiring the study to analyze specified complaints, evaluate whether specified requirements and remedies under State and federal law provide adequate protection to specified purchasers of home appliances, and make a specified determination; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Walker
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0193 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Reports
Statutes of Limitation
Unfair Trade Practices
Warranties
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (105-33)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Finance50
3/22/20133/22/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20134/2/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {287373/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)60
House4/6/20134/1/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (98-30)65
Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.