Civil Rights Commission

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0935
    (SB0823)
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil PenaltiesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1423 / CH0791State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - RequiredDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 791Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1060
    (HB1565)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0823
    (HB0935)
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1565
    (SB1060)
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - ProhibitionDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0461Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1109State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0581Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1596 / CH0738
    (SB1010 / CH0739)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Delegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 738Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1010 / CH0739
    (HB1596 / CH0738)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Senator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 739Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.