Condominiums

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077 / CH0346
    (SB0258 / CH0347)
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0179Condominiums - Amendment of DeclarationsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0218 / CH0128Prince George’s County – Utility Services – Master Meters and Task Force PG 429–18Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0266Condominiums - Lien Priority - Unpaid Water and Sewer ChargesDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0413Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing DocumentsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0415Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0564
    (SB0432)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0575 / CH0345Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common ElementsDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0997Condominiums - Transfer of Control - Common Element ReservesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1491Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and SubmeteringDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0065Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0095Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of InterestSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0216Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included ChargesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0258 / CH0347
    (HB0077 / CH0346)
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain ProvisionsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0432
    (HB0564)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:58 P.M.