Correctional Institutions

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1244 / CH0123Education and Workforce Training Coordinating Council for Correctional Institutions - Name ChangeChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 123Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0911
    (SB0531)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Delegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0792 / CH0383
    (HB1122)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0301
    (SB0414)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0904Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Court and Police Records - Acquittal, Dismissal, or Nolle ProsequiDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0388
    (SB0602 / CH0042)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0414
    (HB0301)
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - ReportSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1122
    (SB0792 / CH0383)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationDelegate HillIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0472 / CH0250
    (SB0207)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0207
    (HB0472 / CH0250)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0419Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - IncapacitySenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0602 / CH0042
    (HB0388)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0531
    (HB0911)
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.