Credit

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0915State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services ProvidersSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0861
    (HB0661)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0749Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - ProhibitionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0700
    (HB0670)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0549 / CH0361
    (HB0529)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the IndividualSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0317Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit CardSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0077 / CH0008
    (HB0312)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0707 / CH0451Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 411-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0670
    (SB0700)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket TransfersDelegate FrickIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0661
    (SB0861)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate ZuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB0529
    (SB0549 / CH0361)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the IndividualDelegate ClippingerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.