Delegate Dereck E. Davis

2013 Regular Session

District 25, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 35 (Primary Sponsor: 10, Co-sponsor: 18, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
Broad Subject
HB0089
    (SB0008 / CH0161)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement SurchargeIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/24/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0117
    (SB0220)
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed AppointmentsIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0122Commercial Law - Automotive Repair Facilities - Tire RepairsIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0124 / CH0186Public Utilities - Telephone Service - Charges for Directory AssistanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0126 / CH0350Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - ScopeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0127
    (SB0405 / CH0046)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Overtime WagesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0167 / CH0352
    (SB0042 / CH0436)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0223Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0229 / CH0004
    (SB0277)
State Aid for Public Education - Certification of Net Taxable IncomeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0316
    (SB0374 / CH0246)
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy ProtectionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0380 / CH0617Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married CouplesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0381
    (SB0495)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental MattersCo-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0578
    (SB0023)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0587 / CH0122Electric Companies - Service Quality and Reliability Standards - Vegetation ManagementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0595
    (SB0609)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0606
    (SB0733)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - New Revival Center of RenewalIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0669 / CH0381
    (SB0447)
Business Regulation - Introduction of Additives into Gasoline - AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0789
    (SB0715 / CH0309)
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1065
    (SB1014)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1090 / CH0327
    (SB0849 / CH0326)
Public Utilities - Consumer Relations - Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility BillsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 327Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1166
    (SB0777 / CH0321)
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and ReinsuranceVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1261
    (SB0890)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - City of District Heights Senior Day Facility ExpansionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1266
    (SB0799)
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio StandardIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1530
    (SB1000)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Walker Mill Daycare and Training CenterIn the House - Rereferred to AppropriationsAppropriationsCo-SponsorPrior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.