District Courts

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1458District Court – County Zoning Violation – AppealsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1726Maryland Dentistry Act - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0256Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0296
    (HB0349)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0349
    (SB0296)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0157Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional LimitSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0771Public Health - Opioid Overdoses - Prohibition and Rehabilitation OrderDelegate CassillyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
SB1259 / CH0370Harford County District Courthouse – H. Wayne Norman, Jr. Memorial PlazaSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1767
    (SB1188)
Wireless Facilities – Permitting and SitingDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0250Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent JurisdictionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0488Criminal Law - Third-Degree AssaultDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0024 / CH0758Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission Fund - EstablishmentDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 758Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Public Safety (E4)
SB0431
    (HB0314)
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator TechnologySenator KelleyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0456
    (HB0953)
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil FinesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1139Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – EnforcementDelegate LiermanIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1260District Court - Nonincarcerable Criminal Cases - SaturdaysDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1188
    (HB1767)
Wireless Facilities - Permitting and SitingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1474Driver's Licenses - Revocation for Firearms on School PropertyDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0618Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant ActsDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0953
    (SB0456)
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil FinesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0035Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court JurisdictionSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0226 / CH0550Real Property - Wrongful Detainer and Distress Actions - Trial by JurySenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0958
    (SB0962)
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional ServicesDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0736
    (HB1128)
Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1128
    (SB0736)
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Assault on a Law Enforcement Officer (Police Protection Act)Delegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0628Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil OffensesSenator SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1448 / CH0792Clerks of the Courts - Traffic Fines - Installment PaymentsDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 792Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1619Civil Actions - Nonattorney Representation - Corporations, Partnerships, LLCs, and Sole ProprietorshipsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.