Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0552 / CH0757
    (HB0742 / CH0756)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 757Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0008 / CH0656State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0040 / CH0150Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology OversightApproved by the Governor - Chapter 150Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0043 / CH0373
    (HB0193 / CH0374)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0058 / CH0411State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0062 / CH0658Maryland Chiropractic Act - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0077 / CH0046
    (HB0188 / CH0045)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0080 / CH0659State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 659Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0085 / CH0369Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - EligibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0089 / CH0060Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0094 / CH0670Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and MammalsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0100 / CH0063Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0106 / CH0048
    (HB0201 / CH0047)
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-TrainingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0110 / CH0662State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and ExaminationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 662Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0112 / CH0061Natural Resources - Tidal Fish LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0113 / CH0062Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.