Family Law

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB1156Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1100
    (HB0677)
Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary EducationSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1019
    (HB0421)
Family Law - Grandparent VisitationSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0978
    (HB1232)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0962
    (HB1386)
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint CustodySenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0924
    (HB0534 / CH0489)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0542 / CH0220State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of BenefitsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0359 / CH0379Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of TestimonySenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0358Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor ChildrenSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0282 / CH0185Early Childhood Development - Transfer of ProvisionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0262
    (HB0772)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0070
    (HB0043)
Duties of Guardian of the Person and Visitation Between Adult Child and ParentSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0031 / CH0152
    (HB0007)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time PeriodSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1477Gestational Agreements - Rights of PartiesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1386
    (SB0962)
Child Custody - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint CustodyDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1232
    (SB0978)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1183Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former NameDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1120Family Law - Automatic InjunctionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0973Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Additions and ExtensionDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0968Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of ParentageDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0911Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0827 / CH0124Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - NotificationDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0772
    (SB0262)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0763State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Domestic Relations OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0677
    (SB1100)
Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary EducationDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0534 / CH0489
    (SB0924)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset RepealDelegate SanchezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0421
    (SB1019)
Family Law - Grandparent VisitationDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0271Child Support - Extraordinary Medical ExpensesDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0259Family Law - Child Support - Custody and VisitationDelegate CarterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0077 / CH0611Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory CouncilChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0043
    (SB0070)
Duties of Guardian of the Person and Visitation Between Adult Child and ParentDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0007
    (SB0031 / CH0152)
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time PeriodDelegate SophocleusIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.