Good Samaritan

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0676
    (HB1021)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death With Dignity ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0672
    (HB0992)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramSenator YoungIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0654 / CH0375
    (HB1009)
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical EmergenciesSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 375Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0578Higher Education - Sexual Assaults - Mandatory ReportingSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0546 / CH0359Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0516 / CH0356
    (HB0745)
Public Health - Overdose Response ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0433 / CH0349Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - DispositionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0344 / CH0342
    (HB0658)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0303
    (HB0222)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0214
    (HB0368 / CH0360)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1103Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - ApprovalDelegate HayesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1021
    (SB0676)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB1009
    (SB0654 / CH0375)
Criminal Procedure - Immunity - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Medical EmergenciesDelegate SmithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0973Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange ProgramsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0745
    (SB0516 / CH0356)
Public Health - Overdose Response ProgramDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0658
    (SB0344 / CH0342)
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)
HB0368 / CH0360
    (SB0214)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0222
    (SB0303)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathDelegate DumaisIn the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0009 / CH0393
    (SB0105)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives ActDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.