Group Homes

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitlePrimary Sponsor StatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
SB0597Public Health - Immunizations - Related InstitutionsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1109 / CH0469Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and ResponsibilitiesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1172 / CH0470Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - LicensesChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0792 / CH0383
    (HB1122)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1238
    (SB0151)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes RenovationsDelegate BarveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0201 / CH0331
    (HB0742)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0170Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - TuTTie's PlaceSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0742
    (SB0201 / CH0331)
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsDelegate HayesIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1122
    (SB0792 / CH0383)
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ TransplantationDelegate HillIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0151
    (HB1238)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Jewish Foundation for Group Homes RenovationsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0861
    (HB0661)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Health (J1)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0299
    (SB0291)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment CenterDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0291
    (HB0299)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment CenterSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0566 / CH0261Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Licensees Providing Services to Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Emergency ActionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0373Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential AreasDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0661
    (SB0861)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security FreezesDelegate ZuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.