HB0072 (CH0489)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489


Synopsis:Authorizing or altering the distribution of specified revenue; increasing from 2 to 3 years the maximum number of years the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene may renew a registration of specified controlled dangerous substances; expanding the uses for which the Department of the Environment may use money in the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; requiring a local school system with a specified structural deficit to provide specified notifications under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015, July 1, 2015, July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Abandoned Property
Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Aircraft
Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Musms; Theat; etc
Assessments
Attorneys' Fees
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Child Care
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Construction
Consumer Price Index
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Conventions
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Credit
Damages
Deaf Persons
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Environment, Department of
Estates and Trusts
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fire Protection
Foreclosure
Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees
Fuel -see also- Coal
Governor
Grants
Group Homes -see also- Assisted Living
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Interest
Investments -see also- Securities
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Leases and Rent
Legal Aid
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Libraries -see also- Archives
Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Schools
Mergers and Acquisitions
Mortgages
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Natural Resources -see also- Conserv; Forest & Park; Wildlds
Nonresidents -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Notices
Nurses
Ocean City
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Private Schools
Program Open Space
Property Tax
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Information
Public Schools
Real Property
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Sales and Use Tax
Special Education
State Aid
State Employees
State Police, Department of
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transfer Tax
Transportation, Department of
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Trees
Unemployment
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Water
Waterway Improvement Fund
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(5-302)
Article - Economic Development
(10-523)
Article - Education
(16-305, 17-104, 23-205, 23-503, 5-114, 5-202, 6-306)
Article - Environment
(4-411)
Article - Health - General
(7-306.3)
Article - Natural Resources
(5-212, 5-212.1, 8-707, 8-709)
Article - Public Safety
(2-801, 4-506)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(7-311)
Article - State Government
(9-20B-05)
Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(21-304, 21-308)
Article - Tax - General
(10-703, 10-704, 10-733, 2-1302.1, 2-606)
Article - Tax - Property
(13-209)
Article - Transportation
(3-216, 4-306, 5-415)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(1992, 2010, 2011, 2013, 2014)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20151/23/2015First Reading Appropriations
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 3/03 at 3:00 p.m.
3/16/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20153/13/2015Favorable with Amendments {154463/143A
Special Order until 3/18 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 43A
3/18/20153/15/2015Favorable with Amendments {154463/145A
Committee Amendment (#1-8)45A
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#3-8) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#9-12) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#13-18) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#19-24) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#25-29)45A
Committee Amendment (#25)45A
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted (90-47)45A
Committee Amendment (#25) Adopted (87-52)45A
Committee Amendment (#26) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#27-29) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#30-35) Adopted45A
Committee Amendment (#36-43) Adopted45A
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted45A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45A
3/19/20153/17/2015Third Reading Passed (122-17)47
Senate3/20/20153/20/2015First Reading Budget and Taxation47
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/147A
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47A
Motion suspend rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted47A
3/24/20153/21/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/148
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/25/20153/22/2015Favorable with Amendments {429137/149
Committee Amendment (#1-7) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#8-12) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#13-17) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#18-23) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {813123/1 Rejected49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/26/20153/23/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {583024/1 Rejected (15-31)50
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)50
House3/31/20153/27/2015House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments57
House Requests Senate Recede57
Conference Committee Appointed57
Delegates McIntosh, Jones, Gaines, Hammen, and Haynes57
House advisors:57
(Delegates Proctor, Beitzel, Hixson and B. Barnes)57
Senate4/1/20153/27/2015Senate Refuses to Recede54
Conference Committee Appointed54
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, McFadden, DeGrange, and Edwards54
Senate advisors:54
(Senators Peters, King, Currie and Serafini)54
House4/13/20154/8/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (90-49)69
Senate4/13/20154/7/2015Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (33-13)65
House4/13/20154/8/2015Passed Enrolled65
Post Passage5/30/20155/30/2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:40 P.M.