HB0103

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - County Boards of Education - Removal of County Superintendents

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing certain county boards of education to remove a county superintendent of schools for immorality, misconduct in office, insubordination, incompetency, or willful neglect of duty; requiring a county superintendent who has been removed to be compensated subject to the terms of a certain contract or, if no such terms exist, for the remainder of the county superintendent's term; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Atterbeary, Turner, and Ebersole
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1603 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Notices
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
School Administration
Statutes:Article - Education
(4-201)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2018 2:45 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/12/20181/12/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/18/20181/18/2018Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 31, 2018 2:38 P.M.