HB0130 (CH0767)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767


Synopsis:Repealing the termination of a distribution of certain local impact grant funds from video lottery terminal proceeds to communities within 3 miles of the Laurel Race Course.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Beidle, Chang, and Sophocleus
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0032
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Gaming
Horse Racing
Narrow Subject(s):Boundaries
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Grants
Lottery
Racing
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Video
Statutes:Article - State Government
(9-1A-31)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:40 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)32
Senate2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation33
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (42-1)63
House4/6/20183/29/2018Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.