HB0141

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Limits on Testing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations limiting the amount of time in the aggregate that may be devoted to federal, State, and locally mandated assessments for each grade to 2% of the specified minimum required annual instructional hours; and prohibiting time devoted to teacher-selected classroom quizzes and exams, portfolio reviews, or performance assessments from being counted toward the specified testing time limits.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, D. Barnes, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gutierrez, Hill, Jalisi, Jameson, Kelly, Lam, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, P. Young, Zucker, Afzali, and A. Miller
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/20/20161/20/2016First Reading Ways and Means
1/27/20161/27/2016Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {495869/1 Report Adopted46
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 46
3/19/20163/17/2016Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/21/20163/18/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)50
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:58 P.M.