HB0145 (CH0289)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 12-18

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289


Synopsis:Prohibiting the Comptroller from issuing more than an aggregate amount of two Class 7 micro-brewery licenses to holders of Class D beer and wine licenses in the Town of Kensington; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue a catering extension to a holder of a Class B-K beer and wine license; requiring certain license holders to exercise the privileges of a catering extension during certain times; reducing from 50% to 40% the ratio of gross receipts between certain food and alcoholic beverages for a Class B-K license holder; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Boundaries
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(25-102, 25-1202, 25-1604, 25-1614, 25-2004, 25-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 1:12 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {113497/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {104139/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20183/24/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)55
House3/30/20183/23/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments57
Third Reading Passed (136-1)57
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.