HB0151 (CH0022)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $1,089,383,121, the proceeds to be used for specified necessary building, construction, demolition, planning, renovation, conversion, replacement, and capital equipment purchases of the State, for acquiring specified real estate in connection therewith, and for grants to specified subdivisions and other organizations for specified development and improvement purposes, subject to specified requirements; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0171
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017, June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
State Bonds
Statutes:Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 48
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments49
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#2-5) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#6-13) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#14-38) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#39-70) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (120-12)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable with Amendments50
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#2-6) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#8) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#9) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#10-17) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#19-25) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#18) Adopted (28-15)50
Committee Amendment (#26) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#27) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#28) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#29-30) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#32-37) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#39-42) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#44) Adopted50
Committee Amendment (#31, 38, 43) Adopted (31-16)50
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/24/20173/22/2017Floor Amendment {763423/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-33)51
Floor Amendment {403428/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)51
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)51
House3/27/20173/22/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments56
House Requests Senate Recede56
Conference Committee Appointed56
Delegates Jones, A. Miller, McIntosh, Gaines, and Ghrist56
House advisors:56
(Delegates Reznik and Haynes)56
Senate3/27/20173/23/2017Senate Refuses to Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators DeGrange, Kasemeyer, Peters, Currie, and Edwards52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators Madaleno, Eckardt and King)52
House3/29/20173/25/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted59
Third Reading Passed (123-13)59
Senate3/29/20173/25/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (46-0)54
House3/29/20173/25/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.