HB0152 (CH0023)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23


Synopsis:Authorizing or altering the distribution of specified revenue; altering or repealing specified required appropriations; authorizing the use of specified funds for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Budget and Management to review specified interagency agreements; requiring the Department of Commerce to report specified information relating to the compliance of specified companies with a specified letter of intent; requiring a specified financial forecast to maximize the use of specified funds; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Operating Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Gaming -see also- Awards, Medals; Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Grants
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Care Commission
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Human Resources, Department of
Income Tax
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Teachers
Transportation, Department of
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(4-512, 4-801)
Article - Education
(18-401, 18-404, 18-501, 18-503, 6-117.1, 6-306, 7-1702, 7-1704)
Article - Health - General
(15-1004, 19-101, 19-111, 19-201, 19-208, 19-213, 19-2201, 19-2401, 2-302)
Article - Housing and Community Development
(4-216, 4-508, 4-509, 6-510)
Article - Local Government
(16-501)
Article - Natural Resources
(5-212)
Article - Public Safety
(4-506)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(2-202, 3-207, 7-115, 7-116, 7-117, 7-118, 7-119, 7-120, 7-121, 7-122, 7-311, 7-314)
Article - State Government
(9-120, 9-1A-27)
Article - Tax - General
(2-202)
Article - Tax - Property
(13-209)
Article - Transportation
(13-955, 2-103.1)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2011, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/13/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {954468/144
Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 44
3/15/20173/12/2017Committee Amendment (#1-7) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#8-12) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#13-18) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#19-24)46
Committee Amendment (#19-21) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#22) Adopted (89-51)46
Committee Amendment (#23-24) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#25-28) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#29) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#30-32)46
Committee Amendment (#30) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#31) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#32) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {273929/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (48-88)46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (112-29)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/20/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/146A
Motion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted46A
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted46A
3/21/20173/19/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/148
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 48
3/22/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments {129234/149
Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#10-13) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#14-17) Adopted49
Committee Amendment (#18-22) Adopted49
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20173/21/2017Floor Amendment {243720/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)50
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6)50
House3/24/20173/21/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments55
House Requests Senate Recede55
Conference Committee Appointed55
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel55
House advisors:55
(Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes and A. Miller)55
Senate3/24/20173/22/2017Senate Refuses to Recede51
Conference Committee Appointed51
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards51
Senate advisors:51
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)51
House3/28/20173/23/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted57
Third Reading Passed (115-25)57
Senate3/28/20173/24/2017Conference Committee Report Adopted53
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5)53
House3/28/20173/23/2017Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.