HB0153 (CH0032)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32


Synopsis:Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,823,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
State Bonds
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20171/18/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 48
3/18/20173/15/2017Second Reading Passed49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (130-0)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20173/27/2017Third Reading Passed (44-0)56
House3/31/20173/27/2017Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:58 P.M.