HB0183 (CH0779)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779


Synopsis:Establishing the Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding certain environmental justice issues and other matters; requiring the Commission to reports its findings and recommendations to the Prince George's County House Delegation on or before December 31, 2018; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Counties - Local Laws
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Discrimination
Environmental Health -see also- Pollution
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/13/20183/13/2018Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018First Reading Senate Rules62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 779

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.