HB0197

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - State Reimbursement for County Board Payments for Exams for Eligible Students

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)


Synopsis:Requiring the State to reimburse a county board for certain payments on a certain application for reimbursement; requiring a county board to pay up to $300 towards the exam fee for a student who takes a certain exam; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, McCray, Rose, Ebersole, C. Howard, M. Washington, and Tarlau
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Public Schools
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {975468/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (135-2)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2018 2:46 P.M.