HB0224 (CH0158)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Election Law - Improving Access to Voting

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158


Synopsis:Requiring an individual who applies to register to vote or update an existing voter registration online to provide specified information; providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to register to vote or update an existing voter registration address and vote during early voting; requiring proof of residency to register or update an existing voter registration address during early voting; specifying methods of requesting an absentee ballot, including through an accessible online application; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Reznik, Barve, Bobo, Carr, Clagett, Davis, Dumais, Frick, Guzzone, Hucker, Lafferty, Luedtke, McHale, Mitchell, Rosenberg, Simmons, Tarrant, M. Washington, Howard, and Cardin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, January 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Ballots
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Drivers' Licenses
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Identification
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signatures
Social Security
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - Election Law
(10-301.1, 16-201, 3-204.1, 3-302, 3-305, 9-305, 9-306, 9-308.1, 9-310)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/21/20131/21/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted50
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523829/1 Rejected (52-76)50
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {563722/1 Rejected (40-93)50
Floor Committee Amendment {965669/1 Adopted50
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 50
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {483128/1 Rejected (44-93)50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (92-43)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {454231/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-11)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (99-40)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.