HB0236 (CH0776)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County - Affordable Housing Commission PG 408-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776


Synopsis:Establishing the Affordable Housing Commission for Prince George's County; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to review certain procedures and practices and use certain information to examine the state of affordable housing in the county; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to certain persons on or before January 1, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Indigent Persons
Leases and Rent
Prince George's County
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20183/28/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.