HB0263 (CH0683)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Carr

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "owner" to repeal the exclusion of motor vehicle rental companies as owners of motor vehicles for the purpose of the enforcement of violations of overtaking and passing school vehicles operating alternately flashing red lights that are recorded by school bus monitoring cameras; requiring a law enforcement agency to provide a specified notice to a motor vehicle rental company before issuing a specified citation; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Carr, Beidle, and Stein
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Citations
Leases and Rent
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
School Buses
Video
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(21-706.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {210018/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (130-3)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable63A
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 63A
Favorable Report Adopted63A
Second Reading Passed63A
4/10/20174/4/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)64
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.